Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edmundo Ponziano Valenzuela Mellid, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Asunción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1944 BornVillarrica del Espíritu Santo
29 Jan 196823.2ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
3 Apr 197126.4Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 Feb 200661.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Chaco Paraguayo, Paraguay
13 Feb 200661.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzalis
22 Apr 200661.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzalis
8 Nov 201167.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Asunción, Paraguay
6 Nov 201470.0SucceededArchbishop of Asunción, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Edmundo Ponziano Valenzuela Mellid:
Archbishop Edmundo Ponziano Valenzuela Mellid S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Asunción

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Asunción.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,136
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2011
  • s: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014