Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Celestino Ocampo Gaona

Bishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1961 Born
24 Apr 199331.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan Bautista de las Misiones, Paraguay
16 Jun 201857.0AppointedBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay
5 Aug 201857.2Ordained BishopBishop of Carapeguá, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Celestino Ocampo Gaona
Bishop Celestino Ocampo Gaona (born ) Bishop of Carapeguá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuruzú Cuatiá
Ordained BishopOutside, near, Inmaculada Concepción de María, Cathedral, Carapeguá, Diocese of Carapeguá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carapeguá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2018
  • ob: CB, 29 Jun 2018
  • c2+: CB, 8 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,833

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast