Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Lomas de Zamora

Dioecesis Clivi Zamorensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Jorge Rubén Lugones, S.J., Bishop
  • Jorge Martín Torres Carbonell, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Jorge Vázquez, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Carlos Alberto Novoa de Agustini, O.F.M. Cap., Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 11 February 1957
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 1,400 (540 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Portela 433, 1832 Lomas de Zamora [Buenos Aires], Argentina
  • Telephone: (011) 4244-5253
  • Fax: 4292-6191

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
11 February 1957ErectedArchdiocese of La Plata Diocese of Lomas de Zamora (erected)
10 April 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Lomas de Zamora
Diocese of Avellaneda (erected)
18 July 1969Territory LostDiocese of Lomas de Zamora
Diocese of Morón
Diocese of San Justo (erected)
24 April 2001Territory LostDiocese of Avellaneda
Diocese of Lomas de Zamora
Diocese of Avellaneda-Lanús

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966745,0001,150,00064.8%771201973,78113149954ap1967
1970850,0001,270,00066.9%801151954,35815952564ap1971
1976946,0001,326,00071.3%73821556,10313345367ap1977
19801,180,0001,456,00081.0%79721517,81411343068ap1981
19901,610,5001,950,00082.6%755713212,2002912744669ap1991
19991,970,2462,348,81383.9%807815812,4695911735073ap2000
20002,009,6502,395,78983.9%846314713,6716411334674ap2001
20011,600,0001,900,00084.2%625111314,1594911329652ap2002
20021,670,0021,855,58090.0%646913312,5564711835353ap2003
20031,686,7021,874,13590.0%636612913,0755810724353ap2004
20041,771,0372,061,54885.9%616512614,0556810424353ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.3, 15 Nov 2014; Data: 22 Nov 2014