Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Archidioecesis Bonaërensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mario Aurelio Poli, Cardinal, Archbishop
  • Enrique Eguía Seguí, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Eduardo Horacio García, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Ernesto Giobando, S.J., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Alejandro Daniel Giorgi, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joaquín Mariano Sucunza, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Horacio Ernesto Benites Astoul, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Guillermo Leaden, S.D.B., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 5 March 1866
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 203 (78 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzbaires.org.ar/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Rivadavia 415, C1002AAC Buenos Aires, Argentina
  • Telephone: (011)4343-0812
  • Fax: 4334-8373; 4342-9238

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Buenos Aires
6 April 1620ErectedDiocese of Paraguay Diocese of Buenos Aires (erected)
1830Territory LostDiocese of Buenos Aires Vicariate Apostolic of Montevideo (erected)
13 June 1859Territory LostDiocese of Buenos Aires Diocese of Paraná (erected)
Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
5 March 1866ElevatedDiocese of Buenos Aires Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
15 February 1897Territory LostArchdiocese of Buenos Aires Diocese of La Plata (erected)
20 April 1934Territory LostArchdiocese of Buenos Aires Diocese of Viedma (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
19503,200,0003,600,00088.9%3665208863,6114,650119ap1951
19593,301,0003,842,00085.9%4135399523,4677913,720135ap1960
19652,693,0003,226,90083.5%4235509732,7679003,800148ap1967
19702,700,0003,100,00087.1%4045009042,9868003,470152ap1971
19762,700,0003,000,00090.0%3835509332,8939102,900158ap1977
19802,784,0003,190,00087.3%2565508063,4541,0162,970162ap1981
19903,096,0003,336,00092.8%4324458773,53029562,134175ap1991
19993,506,0003,826,00091.6%5044119153,83138412,011181ap2000
20003,506,0003,826,00091.6%4683808484,13457501,687182ap2001
20012,750,0003,043,43190.4%4643878513,23156971,735182ap2002
20022,500,0002,729,61091.6%4653728372,98666521,711182ap2003
20032,500,0002,729,61091.6%4694088772,85047711,537182ap2004
20042,500,0002,729,61091.6%4624228842,82847551,611182ap2005
20062,554,0002,789,00091.6%4604268862,88267561,638183ap2008
20112,647,0002,891,08291.6%4693658343,17376471,732186ap2012
20122,671,0002,917,00091.6%4713207913,376114881,383186ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014