Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcolino (del Carmelo) Benavente, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1845Born
13 Jan 186418.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Jan 189953.3AppointedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
12 Mar 189953.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
19 Mar 189953.5InstalledBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
28 Sep 191065.1DiedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Marcolino (del Carmelo) Benavente (VIAF: 283038155)
Bishop Marcolino (del Carmelo) Benavente O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio Areco, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopS. Dominique, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017