Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Terrero y Escalada

Deceased

Bishop of La Plata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1850BornBuenos Aires
18 Dec 188030.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 189847.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Apr 189847.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
19 Jun 189847.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dercos (Dercus)
12 Dec 190050.3AppointedBishop of La Plata, Argentina
3 Mar 190150.6InstalledBishop of La Plata, Argentina
10 Jan 192170.4DiedBishop of La Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Nepomuceno Terrero y Escalada:
Bishop Juan Nepomuceno Terrero y Escalada (born , died ) Bishop of La Plata

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,235
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 241, and Page 459

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013