Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel d’Andrea

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Temnus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1877BornNavarro
23 Dec 189922.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
18 Dec 191942.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
18 Dec 191942.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Temnus
13 Jun 192042.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temnus
23 Jun 196083.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Miguel d’Andrea:
Bishop Miguel d’Andrea (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013