Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leandro Bautista Astelarra

Deceased

Bishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Dec 1883Born
1 Nov 190824.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 193450.7AppointedBishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
3 Mar 193551.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
23 Mar 193551.2InstalledBishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
24 Aug 194359.7DiedBishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Leandro Bautista Astelarra
Bishop Leandro Bautista Astelarra (born , died ) Bishop of Bahía Blanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampana

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018