Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop César Antonio Cáneva

Deceased

Bishop of Azul, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1874Born
21 Dec 190127.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Sep 193460.4AppointedBishop of Azul, Argentina
25 Feb 193560.9Ordained BishopBishop of Azul, Argentina
25 May 195379.1DiedBishop of Azul, Argentina

MicroData Summary for César Antonio Cáneva
Bishop César Antonio Cáneva (born , died ) Bishop of Azul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarlazzo, Italy

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018