Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Venceslao Javier José Achával y Medina, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1810Born
28 Oct 183323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
15 Oct 186757.7SelectedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
20 Dec 186757.9ConfirmedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
4 Oct 186858.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
10 Nov 186858.8InstalledBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
25 Feb 189888.1DiedBishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Venceslao Javier José Achával y Medina (VIAF: 51520285)
Bishop Venceslao Javier José Achával y Medina O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago del Estero
Ordained BishopSan Francisco, Convent, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 322
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017