Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Matera

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Colombia

Titular Archbishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1820Born
21 Dec 184525.8Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 187959.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Argentina
19 Sep 187959.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Paraguay
19 Sep 187959.6AppointedApostolic Delegate to Uruguay
30 Mar 188262.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
16 Jul 188262.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
14 Oct 188464.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Argentina
14 Oct 188464.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Paraguay
14 Oct 188464.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Uruguay
17 May 188767.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
1 Aug 189070.4RetiredApostolic Delegate to Colombia
29 Nov 189171.7DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luigi Matera
Archbishop Luigi Matera (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Colombia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017