Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan José Blas Tissera, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1825Born
26 Jan 184721.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
27 Mar 188459.0AppointedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
21 Sep 188459.5Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
20 Sep 188661.5DiedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan José Blas Tissera
Bishop Juan José Blas Tissera O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnejos Sur, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
Ordained BishopCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 226
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017