Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Uladislao Javier Castellano

Deceased

Archbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1834Born
18 Nov 185823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
1 Oct 189257.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
1 Oct 189257.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Anchialus
20 Nov 189257.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anchialus
12 Sep 189560.8AppointedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
6 Feb 190065.2DiedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Uladislao Javier Castellano
Archbishop Uladislao Javier Castellano (born , died ) Archbishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Javier, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
Death PlaceSan Javier, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,232
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 567
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 67
  • mn/op/d.loc: CB, 30 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast