Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rosendo de la Lastra y Gordillo

Deceased

Bishop of Paraná, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1856Born
24 Sep 188125.3Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
1 Oct 189236.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
1 Oct 189236.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
30 Nov 189236.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Miletopolis
8 Feb 189841.7AppointedBishop of Paraná, Argentina
28 May 189842.0InstalledBishop of Paraná, Argentina
3 Jul 190953.1DiedBishop of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rosendo de la Lastra y Gordillo (VIAF: 7021549)
Bishop Rosendo de la Lastra y Gordillo (born , died ) Bishop of Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Córdoba, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a priest for 27.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,233
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 384, and Page 440
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017