Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matías Linares y Sanzetenea

Deceased

Bishop of Salta, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1841Born
Jan 1865³23.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salta, Argentina
8 Feb 189856.4AppointedBishop of Salta, Argentina
8 May 189856.6Ordained BishopBishop of Salta, Argentina
2 Apr 191472.5DiedBishop of Salta, Argentina

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matías Linares y Sanzetenea
Bishop Matías Linares y Sanzetenea (born , died ) Bishop of Salta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalta, Diocese of Salta
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salta, Diocese of Salta

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,720
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 494
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017