Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tucumán

Archidioecesis Tucumanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alfredo Horacio Zecca, Archbishop
  • Luis Héctor Villalba, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 11 February 1957
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 10,996 (4,247 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arztucuman.org.ar/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Av. Sarmiento 895, T4000GTI San Miguel de Tucuman [Tucuman], Argentina
  • Telephone: (0381)431.06.17
  • Fax: 422.63.45

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tucumán
15 February 1897ErectedDiocese of Salta Diocese of Tucumán (erected)
Archdiocese of Tucumán
11 February 1957ElevatedDiocese of Tucumán Archdiocese of Tucumán
12 August 1963Territory LostArchdiocese of Tucumán Diocese of Concepción (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tucumán
1949610,000659,11792.5%47891364,48513048529ap1951
Archdiocese of Tucumán
1966550,000597,29992.1%531301833,00515026532ap1967
1970400,000540,00074.1%55891442,77710227440ap1971
1976400,000570,00070.2%54901442,77710528437ap1977
1980593,800657,00090.4%55731284,63928622636ap1981
1990817,000899,00090.9%60851455,63499124647ap1991
1999856,835969,81988.3%76591356,346157518746ap2000
2000868,732983,28588.3%78531316,631156517147ap2001
2001879,178996,17888.3%79581376,417157218946ap2002
2002899,7931,021,33288.1%84651496,038157418447ap2003
2003908,2241,030,90288.1%85681535,936149123445ap2004
2004911,8491,035,01788.1%86581446,332149017245ap2005
20101,034,2011,112,00093.0%89541437,232107416447ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 22 Jun 2013