Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Ferro

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1908BornFamaillá
8 Jul 193426.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Aug 196355.1AppointedBishop of Concepción, Argentina
21 Dec 196355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Argentina
25 Dec 196355.5InstalledBishop of Concepción, Argentina
7 Mar 198071.7DiedBishop of Concepción, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Ferro:
Bishop Juan Carlos Ferro (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013