Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Carlos Cardinal Aramburu

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1912BornReducción
28 Oct 193422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Río Cuarto, Argentina
7 Oct 194634.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina
7 Oct 194634.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Plataea
15 Dec 194634.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plataea
28 Aug 195341.5AppointedBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
1 Nov 195341.7InstalledBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
13 Mar 195745.1AppointedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
14 Jun 196755.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
14 Jun 196755.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Turres in Byzacena
21 Apr 197563.2AppointedBishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
22 Apr 197563.2SucceededArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
24 May 197664.3Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197664.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini
10 Jul 199078.4RetiredArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
30 Oct 199078.7RetiredBishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
18 Nov 200492.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Aramburu:
Juan Carlos Cardinal Aramburu (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 70.1 years
  • a bishop for 57.9 years
  • a cardinal for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 108
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 14 Nov 2014