Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaldo Clemente Canale

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Cabarsussi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1925BornBuenos Aires
3 Aug 195226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
10 Jun 197751.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
10 Jun 197751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
13 Aug 197751.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cabarsussi
30 Jul 199064.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Arnaldo Clemente Canale:
Bishop Arnaldo Clemente Canale (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991, Page 1,118
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 4 Jan 2015