Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Roque Esteban Arana

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Río Cuarto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1916BornBuenos Aires
23 Sep 194428.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 197356.4AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
1 Apr 197356.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
7 Apr 197356.5InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
6 Aug 198467.9AppointedBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
26 Aug 198467.9InstalledBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
22 Apr 199275.6RetiredBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
8 Jan 200386.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Río Cuarto, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Roque Esteban Arana:
Bishop Adolfo Roque Esteban Arana (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Río Cuarto

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015