Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luis Mariano Montemayor

Apostolic Nuncio to Colombia

Titular Archbishop of Illici


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1956 Born
15 Nov 198529.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 200852.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Illici
19 Jun 200852.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sénégal
19 Jun 200852.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cape Verde
19 Jun 200852.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mauritania
6 Aug 200852.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Illici
17 Sep 200852.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea-Bissau
22 Jun 201559.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
27 Sep 201862.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia

MicroData Summary for Luis Mariano Montemayor
Archbishop Luis Mariano Montemayor (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Colombia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Colombia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Sep 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,943
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 27 Sep 2018

Quantcast