Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Arturo Quintero Gómez

Bishop of Armenia, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1967 Born
4 Dec 199326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Armenia, Colombia
12 Dec 201851.3AppointedBishop of Armenia, Colombia
2 Feb 201951.4Ordained BishopBishop of Armenia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Arturo Quintero Gómez
Bishop Carlos Arturo Quintero Gómez (born ) Bishop of Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArmenia, Diocese of Armenia
Ordained BishopLa Inmaculada Concepción, Cathedral, Armenia, Diocese of Armenia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Armenia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2018
  • c1: CB, 12 Dec 2018
  • ob: CB, 25 Dec 2018
  • c2+: CB, 26 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Feb 2019

Quantcast