Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dominique François Joseph Cardinal Mamberti

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Deacon of Santo Spirito in Sassia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1952 BornMarrakesh, Morocco
20 Sep 198129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ajaccio, France
18 May 200250.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sagone
18 May 200250.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sudan
18 May 200250.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to Somalia
3 Jul 200250.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sagone
17 Jan 200451.8ResignedApostolic Delegate to Somalia
19 Feb 200451.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Eritrea
15 Sep 200654.5AppointedSecretary (Relations with States) of the Secretariat of State
8 Nov 201462.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
14 Feb 201562.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santo Spirito in Sassia
14 Feb 201562.9Elevated to Cardinal

MicroData Summary for Dominique François Joseph Mamberti:
Dominique François Joseph Cardinal Mamberti (born ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

Please contact the Cardinal through the Apostolic Signatura.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,219
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2014
  • c: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2015
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015