Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Boccardi

Apostolic Nuncio to Japan

Titular Archbishop of Bitettum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1953 Born
24 Jun 197926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Larino, Italy
16 Jan 200753.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bitettum
16 Jan 200753.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sudan
30 Jan 200753.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Eritrea
18 Mar 200753.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Bitettum
11 Jul 201360.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iran
11 Mar 202167.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Japan

MicroData Summary for Leo Boccardi
Archbishop Leo Boccardi (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Japan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martino in Pensilis
Ordained BishopSan Pio da Pietrelcina, Church, San Giovanni Rotondo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Japan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,351
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Mar 2021

Quantcast