Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Iran



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Andrzej Józwowicz, Apostolic Nuncio

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 2 May 1953
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Iran, Islamic Republic of
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 11155-178, Crossroad Neuaphle-Le-Chateau, 84 Razi Avenue, Teheran, Iran
  • Telephone: (98-21)6640.35.74 ext 602, 104

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Persia
13 March 1874EstablishedDelegation to Persia
Delegation to Iran
1948Name ChangedDelegation to Persia Delegation to Iran
Nunciature to Iran
2 May 1953ElevatedDelegation to Iran Nunciature to Iran (to Internunciature)
25 March 1966ElevatedNunciature to Iran (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Nunciature to Iran
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 542, and Page 543
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 350, and Page 351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 1 Sep 2023