Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Syria



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mario Zenari, Cardinal, Apostolic Nuncio
  • Giovanni Battista Morandini, Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Established: 27 June 1762
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Syrian Arab Republic
  • Mailing Address: B.P. 2271, Malki, Place Ma'raket Ajnadin, Damas, Syria
  • Telephone: (963-11)333.26.01; 333.24.46

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
27 June 1762EstablishedNunciature to Syria
11 March 1929Territory LostDelegation to Egypt, Arabia, Eritrea and Ethiopia (Abyssiniae)
Nunciature to Syria (Palestine, TransJordan, and island of Cyprus)
Delegation to Egypt, Arabia, Eritrea, Ethiopia, Palestine, TransJordan, and Island of Cyprus
21 February 1953ElevatedNunciature to Syria (to Internunciature)
11 February 1966ElevatedNunciature to Syria (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 225
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 204

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 16 Jun 2024