Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Villardel, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

Titular Archbishop of Philippi

Apostolic Delegate to Syria


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Mar 1839AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
8 Mar 1839AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
8 Mar 1839AppointedApostolic Delegate to Syria
21 Apr 1839Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
19 Jun 1852DiedVicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria

MicroData Summary for Francisco Villardel
Archbishop Francisco Villardel O.F.M. Obs. (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1839, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Oct 2016