Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Vespignani

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1800BornRoma
21 Dec 182222.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 183434.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
12 Oct 183434.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyana
24 Jan 184241.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orvieto, Italy
2 Feb 186564.9DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Vespignani:
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Vespignani (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 382, and Page 384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013