Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Faldi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano e Matelica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1781BornTrasasso
11 Sep 181433.6Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 183756.6AppointedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
5 Nov 183756.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
18 Nov 185877.8ResignedBishop of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy
Jan 1863³81.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Fabriano e Matelica, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Faldi (VIAF: 88882066)
Bishop Francesco Faldi (born , died Jan 1863) Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano e Matelica

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 267
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1837, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016