Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Petocchi (Pettochi)

Deceased

Bishop of Nepi e Sutri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1786BornTerracina
21 Apr 181024.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 185064.2AppointedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
21 May 185064.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
7 Aug 185569.4DiedBishop of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Petocchi (Pettochi) (VIAF: 89275575)
Bishop Gaspare Petocchi (Pettochi) (born , died ) Bishop of Nepi e Sutri

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 409
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1850, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016