Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Letterio Turchi

Deceased

Bishop of Cittą di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1789BornApiro
12 Jun 181324.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 184353.8AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
18 Apr 184353.9Ordained BishopBishop of Norcia, Italy
20 May 185061.0AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
8 Nov 186172.4DiedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Letterio Turchi:
Bishop Letterio Turchi (born , died ) Bishop of Cittą di Castello

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1845
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 206
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013