Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Bachetoni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Norcia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1804Born
23 Dec 182622.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jan 182823.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 185045.7AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
21 May 185045.7Ordained BishopBishop of Norcia, Italy
27 Nov 1880³76.2ResignedBishop of Norcia, Italy
13 Dec 188076.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
1881²76.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Norcia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Bachetoni (VIAF: 88705822)
Bishop Raffaele Bachetoni (born , died 1881) Bishop Emeritus of Norcia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto
Ordained BishopSan Carlo al Corso, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 399, and Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1850, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017