Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Bucchi-Accica

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1826Born
29 Oct 184822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Norcia, Italy
22 Dec 187347.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Norcia, Italy
22 Dec 187347.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
11 Jan 187447.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
13 Dec 188054.6AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
30 Dec 188963.7AppointedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
18 Oct 190377.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orvieto, Italy
7 Jan 190578.7DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Bucchi-Accica
Archbishop Domenico Bucchi-Accica (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorcia, Diocese of Norcia
Ordained BishopS. Alphonse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 356, and Page 421
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017