Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Thomas Hynes, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana, Guyana

Titular Bishop of Lerus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1799BornCork, Ireland
2 Mar 182222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 May 183838.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
8 May 183838.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lerus
29 Jul 183838.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lerus
14 Aug 183838.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Corfý, Greece
12 Sep 184344.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
21 Sep 184647.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
25 Nov 185758.2ResignedVicar Apostolic of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles
30 Mar 186969.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana, Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for John Thomas Hynes
Bishop John Thomas Hynes O.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of British Guiana

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 145, and Page 163
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 237
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1838, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Aug 2016