Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Dominico Faustino Ceretti, O.M.V. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ava e Peg¨

Titular Bishop of Antaeopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1793BornAlice Castello
19 Mar 183542.0ProfessedPriest of Oblates of the Virgin Mary
5 Jul 184249.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
5 Jul 184249.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
31 Jul 184249.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
26 Dec 184653.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar
25 Dec 185562.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ava e Peg¨, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Dominico Faustino Ceretti
Bishop Giovanni Dominico Faustino Ceretti O.M.V. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Ava e Peg¨

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1842, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016