Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Bettacchini, C.O. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Colombo

Titular Bishop of Torone

Vicar Apostolic of Jaffna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1810²BornPiosina, Italy
1840¹30.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 184535.3AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Colombo, Sri Lanka
6 May 184535.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Torone
8 Feb 184636.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Torone
28 Aug 184939.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
26 Jul 185747.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orazio Bettacchini
Bishop Orazio Bettacchini C.O. (born 1810, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Colombo

  • a priest for 17.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016