Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jaffna

Dioecesis Iaffnensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Colombo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Sri Lanka
  • Square Kilometers: 4,400 (1,699 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 2, Jaffna, Sri Lanka
  • Telephone: (021)222.21.61
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Jaffna
17 February 1845ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Jaffna (erected)
Diocese of Jaffna
1 September 1886ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Jaffna Diocese of Jaffna
25 August 1893Territory LostDiocese of Jaffna Diocese of Trincomalee (erected)
19 December 1975Territory LostDiocese of Jaffna
Diocese of Trincomalee-Batticaloa
Prefecture Apostolic of Anuradhapura (erected)
24 January 1981Territory LostDiocese of Jaffna Diocese of Mannar (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jaffna
195063,652415,33515.3%14769070712320142ap1951
1970124,5821,100,00011.3%4055951,31182362391ap1971
1980172,667994,00017.4%5732891,9406634456ap1981
1990156,1201,000,00015.6%5344971,6097335443ap1991
1999155,8401,064,43614.6%7515901,7312619049ap2000
2000157,3981,064,46414.8%7915941,6742819549ap2001
2001159,7821,093,15314.6%84161001,5973019349ap2002
2002161,5811,093,15314.8%87191061,5244219349ap2003
2003163,9501,359,53912.1%80291091,5045419149ap2004
2004166,3291,625,92510.2%91331241,3416020150ap2005
2006163,8951,406,23011.7%98321301,2606421251ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 16 Apr 2013