Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Trincomalee

Dioecesis Trincomaliensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 3 July 2012
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Colombo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Sri Lanka
  • Square Kilometers: 2,727 (1,053 Square Miles)
  • Description: District of Trincomalee

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Trincomalee
25 August 1893ErectedDiocese of Jaffna Diocese of Trincomalee (erected)
Diocese of Trincomalee-Batticaloa
23 October 1967Name ChangedDiocese of Trincomalee Diocese of Trincomalee-Batticaloa
19 December 1975Territory LostDiocese of Jaffna
Diocese of Trincomalee-Batticaloa
Prefecture Apostolic of Anuradhapura (erected)
3 July 2012SplitDiocese of Trincomalee-Batticaloa Diocese of Batticaloa
Diocese of Trincomalee
Diocese of Trincomalee
3 July 2012SplitDiocese of Trincomalee-Batticaloa Diocese of Batticaloa
Diocese of Trincomalee

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Trincomalee
195018,014296,0006.1%141933545557113ap1951
Diocese of Trincomalee-Batticaloa
197035,946680,0005.3%302656641537620ap1971
198043,600813,0005.4%272350872507026ap1981
199054,5591,096,0005.0%3017471,1601526932ap1991
199967,5461,423,8574.7%3112431,5704410229ap2000
200068,8001,443,7904.8%3211431,6004310229ap2001
200170,6711,464,0034.8%3916551,2844510229ap2002
200260,4641,484,4994.1%3620561,0793910629ap2003
200365,1871,499,3434.3%4320631,0344410230ap2004
200462,0781,514,3364.1%4315581,0704110831ap2005
201078,5181,607,8654.9%4625711,1054010835ap2011
201278,5181,623,9434.8%5225771,0191510834FIDES
Diocese of Trincomalee
201223,293423,9775.5%17122980343510FIDES

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 3 Apr 2013