Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Bastiampillai Deogupillai

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jaffna, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1917Born
22 Dec 194124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
9 Feb 196749.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trincomalee-Batticaloa, Sri Lanka
9 Feb 196749.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
11 May 196750.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mozotcori
18 Dec 197255.6AppointedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
6 Jul 199275.2RetiredBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
25 Apr 200386.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Jacob Bastiampillai Deogupillai
Bishop Jacob Bastiampillai Deogupillai (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaffna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarampon

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018