Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Ranchi

Archidioecesis Ranchiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 September 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 5,299 (2,046 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.ranchiarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 5, Dr. Camil Bulcke Path, Ranchi-834001, Jharkhand, India
  • Telephone: (0651)235.07.28
  • Fax: 235.01.44

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ranchi
25 May 1927ErectedArchdiocese of Calcutta Diocese of Ranchi (erected)
14 June 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Calcutta
Diocese of Nagpur
Diocese of Ranchi
Diocese of Sambalpur (erected)
13 December 1951Territory LostDiocese of Nagpur
Diocese of Ranchi
Diocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur (erected)
Archdiocese of Ranchi
19 September 1953ElevatedDiocese of Ranchi Archdiocese of Ranchi
5 June 1971Territory LostArchdiocese of Ranchi Diocese of Daltonganj (erected)
22 June 1984Territory LostArchdiocese of Ranchi Diocese of Port Blair (erected)
28 May 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Ranchi Diocese of Gumla (erected)
28 May 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Ranchi Diocese of Simdega (erected)
1 April 1995Territory LostArchdiocese of Ranchi Diocese of Khunti (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Ranchi
1949346,5787,950,0004.4%481241722,01412423450ap1951
Archdiocese of Ranchi
1969326,0446,944,7754.7%811792601,25438562862ap1971
1980344,9043,215,00010.7%901802701,27743886266ap1981
1990411,9093,193,00012.9%1662183841,07236983493ap1991
1999107,8521,872,3245.8%3512015569524457628ap2000
2000110,9211,872,3245.9%3514317862330656528ap2001
2001113,6452,454,0444.6%4213417664525459328ap2002
2002114,6832,517,3724.6%4212817067421971430ap2003
2003115,2012,796,8924.1%5113218362925768830ap2004
2004116,7582,863,9964.1%4512917467125472431ap2005
2010132,7673,032,4964.4%6019725751628691533ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.6, 8 Jan 2013; data: 16 Jan 2013