Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Raigarh

Dioecesis Raigarhensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Toppo, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 10 November 1977
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Raipur
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 7,086 (2,736 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://raigarhdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, St. Michael's Church, Rambhata, Raigarh-496001, Chhattisgarh, India
  • Telephone: 798.7739.427
  • Fax: (07762)226.523

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur
13 December 1951ErectedDiocese of Nagpur (Rest of Raigarh)
Diocese of Ranchi (Surguia and most of Raigarh)
Diocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur (erected)
19 September 1953Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur (from Calcutta)
13 September 1963Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur (from Nagpur)
10 November 1977SplitDiocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur Diocese of Ambikapur (Surguja)
Diocese of Raigarh
Diocese of Raigarh
10 November 1977SplitDiocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur Diocese of Ambikapur (Surguja)
Diocese of Raigarh
27 February 2004Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Raigarh (from Bhopal)
23 March 2006Territory LostDiocese of Raigarh (Jashpur) Diocese of Jashpur (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur
1970168,9802,227,9647.6%3847851,9886716713ap1971
Diocese of Raigarh
1980172,6701,316,00013.1%3934732,3653724724ap1981
1990210,0001,526,00013.8%82401221,7215830839ap1991
1999238,8872,110,30511.3%121431641,4565242250ap2000
2000246,3372,175,93611.3%129401691,4574637051ap2001
2001251,2302,219,18111.3%138421801,3955642955ap2002
2002237,6902,238,48610.6%139361751,3585039458ap2003
2003242,1252,257,95810.7%145491941,2486441861ap2004
2004242,9152,258,74810.8%145491941,2526343164ap2005
200656,6401,265,0844.5%438511,1109218bul23Mar2006
201061,7701,367,0004.5%536591,04679821ap2011
201464,4011,493,6274.3%5511669751112421ap2015
201766,8461,513,0254.4%6013739151312446ap2018
202073,6651,578,0004.7%5712691,0671213425ap2021

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 44, Page 393, to Page 395
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 83, to Page 87
  • Diocese of Raigarh
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 70, Page 82, and Page 83
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 70, Page 265
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 96, Page 390, and Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 10 Aug 2023