Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Kerketta

Bishop of Jashpur, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1952 Born
5 May 198432.1Ordained PriestPriest of Raigarh, India
23 Mar 200654.0IncardinatedPriest of Jashpur, India
22 Dec 200957.7AppointedBishop of Jashpur, India
2 Feb 201057.8Ordained BishopBishop of Jashpur, India

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Kerketta
Bishop Emmanuel Kerketta (born ) Bishop of Jashpur

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGotmahua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jashpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,566

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast