Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nagpur

Archidioecesis Nagpurensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 19 September 1953
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 55,272 (21,348 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 25 Kamptee Road, Mohan Nagar P.O., Nagpur-440001, Maharashtra, India
  • Telephone: (0712)533.239
  • Fax: 527.906

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nagpur
11 July 1887ErectedDiocese of Vizagapatam Diocese of Nagpur (erected)
18 July 1932Territory LostDiocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Nagpur
Prefecture Apostolic of Jubbulpore (erected)
11 March 1935Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer
Diocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Nagpur
Prefecture Apostolic of Indore (erected)
14 June 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Calcutta
Diocese of Nagpur
Diocese of Ranchi
Diocese of Sambalpur (erected)
13 December 1951Territory LostDiocese of Nagpur
Diocese of Ranchi
Diocese of Raigarh-Ambikapur (erected)
Archdiocese of Nagpur
19 September 1953ElevatedDiocese of Nagpur Archdiocese of Nagpur
8 May 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Nagpur Diocese of Amravati (erected)
16 January 1964Territory LostArchdiocese of Nagpur
Prefecture Apostolic of Pala
Diocese of Pala
29 July 1968Territory LostDiocese of Amravati
Archdiocese of Nagpur
Apostolic Exarchate of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nagpur
195034,16915,396,710.2%2625516693821221ap1951
Archdiocese of Nagpur
196912,6843,336,684.4%4724711784915415ap1971
198013,84410,972,000.1%4736831662262305ap1981
199015,39313,323,000.1%5233851811932535ap1991
199922,66311,050,000.2%445710122424032424ap2000
200022,62611,500,000.2%435810122421832432ap2001
200123,18511,000,000.2%426210422225039732ap2002
200223,28611,000,000.2%448412818135340332ap2003
200324,47911,000,000.2%458012519541940721ap2004
200424,44611,000,000.2%448012419737942124ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 15 Jun 2013