Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jabalpur

Dioecesis Iabalpurensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 5 July 1954
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bhopal
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 52,980 (20,463 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 599 South Civil Lines, Jabalpur-482001, M.P., India
  • Telephone: (0761)501.83.22
  • Fax: 262.24.13

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Jubbulpore
18 July 1932ErectedDiocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Nagpur
Prefecture Apostolic of Jubbulpore (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Jabalpur
21 October 1950Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Jubbulpore Prefecture Apostolic of Jabalpur
Diocese of Jabalpur
5 July 1954ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Jabalpur Diocese of Jabalpur
13 September 1963Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur
Diocese of Indore
Diocese of Jabalpur
Archdiocese of Bhopal (erected)
29 July 1968Territory LostDiocese of Jabalpur Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Satna (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Jabalpur
19505,9838,890,542.1%42832186652ap1951
Diocese of Jabalpur
197014,2533,831,459.4%32144630927954ap1971
198018,2135,373,000.3%431154337171298ap1981
199025,4416,723,000.4%422062410281779ap1991
199925,1308,017,000.3%624811022810925612ap2000
200025,8678,115,000.3%624811023510925012ap2001
200129,1878,145,000.4%624911126210024512ap2002
200228,8038,150,000.4%654911425210027312ap2003
200325,1879,032,285.3%705412420311727812ap2004
200425,2928,450,000.3%715412520211728112ap2005
200628,7879,032,285.3%766213820811733012ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011