Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Indore

Dioecesis Indorensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Chacko Thottumarickal, S.V.D., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 May 1952
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bhopal
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 19,073 (7,366 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 10 Old Sehore Road, P.O. Box 168, Indore 452001, M.P., India
  • Telephone: (0731)249.22.03
  • Fax: 249.46.30

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Indore
11 March 1935ErectedDiocese of Ajmer
Diocese of Allahabad
Diocese of Nagpur
Prefecture Apostolic of Indore (erected)
Diocese of Indore
15 May 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Indore Diocese of Indore
13 September 1963Territory LostDiocese of Ajmer and Jaipur
Diocese of Indore
Diocese of Jabalpur
Archdiocese of Bhopal (erected)
29 July 1968Territory LostDiocese of Indore Apostolic Exarchate of Ujjain (Syro-Malabarese) (erected)
3 February 1977Territory LostDiocese of Indore Diocese of Khandwa (erected)
25 March 2002Territory LostDiocese of Indore
Diocese of Udaipur
Diocese of Jhabua (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Indore
195016,5856,000,000.3%33134487775ap1951
Diocese of Indore
197027,6565,400,000.5%2041614537016626ap1971
198013,4624,481,000.3%173047286571374ap1981
199017,2676,647,000.3%3347802151353377ap1991
199937,8968,519,538.4%496111034410336445ap2000
200038,3418,719,538.4%485910735811237845ap2001
200144,6739,114,915.5%466110741710837145ap2002
200219,2064,496,287.4%2744712709223321ap2003
200319,2064,496,287.4%2245672866423021ap2004
200419,2064,496,287.4%2251732636930821ap2005
200635,6744,514,518.8%2551764696930821ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 29 Jul 2012