Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Marian Anathil, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Indore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1932BornAthirampuzha
2 Oct 195927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
18 Dec 197240.5AppointedBishop of Indore, India
29 Jun 197341.0Ordained BishopBishop of Indore, India
24 Oct 200876.3RetiredBishop of Indore, India
2 May 200976.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Indore, India

MicroData Summary for George Marian Anathil:
Bishop George Marian Anathil S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Indore

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2008
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013