Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Cornelio, S.V.D.

Archbishop of Bhopal, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1945 Born
14 Nov 197227.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
3 Jun 199954.2AppointedBishop of Khandwa, India
8 Sep 199954.4Ordained BishopBishop of Khandwa, India
15 Jun 200762.2AppointedArchbishop of Bhopal, India
16 Sep 200762.5InstalledArchbishop of Bhopal, India

MicroData Summary for Leo Cornelio
Archbishop Leo Cornelio S.V.D. (born ) Archbishop of Bhopal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKukkunje

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bhopal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2007
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,603

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jan 2017