Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Thennatt, S.A.C.

Bishop of Gwalior, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1953 Born
31 May 197521.5Solemn ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
21 Oct 197824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
18 Oct 201662.8AppointedBishop of Gwalior, India
8 Jan 201763.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gwalior, India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Thennatt
Bishop Thomas Thennatt S.A.C. (born ) Bishop of Gwalior

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoodalloor, Eparchy of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar)
Ordained BishopSt. Paul, Church, Gwalior, Diocese of Gwalior

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gwalior.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2016
  • ob: CB, 1 Nov 2016
  • c2+: CB, 3 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jan 2017