Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Quilon

Dioecesis Quilonensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stanley Roman, Bishop
  • Joseph Gabriel Fernandez, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 1 September 1886
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Trivandrum
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 1,950 (753 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.quilondiocese.com/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Tangasseri P.O., Kollam-691007, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0474)2796.140
  • Fax: 2791.850

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
1 September 1886ErectedDiocese of Quilon (erected)
26 May 1930Territory LostDiocese of Quilon Diocese of Kottar (erected)
1 July 1937Territory LostDiocese of Quilon Diocese of Trivandrum (erected)
21 December 1985Territory LostDiocese of Quilon Diocese of Punalur (erected)
17 June 2004Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Quilon (from Verapoly)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
195095,9811,805,4255.3%6618841,1423111352ap1951
1969134,0022,588,5005.2%9291011,3262246266ap1971
1980193,0194,002,1024.8%83191021,8922671248ap1981
1990194,1043,746,0005.2%7221932,0872980760ap1991
1999205,7484,553,4594.5%6828962,1436659560ap2000
2000208,1884,621,7464.5%6629952,1915160669ap2001
2001277,8694,462,7776.2%6827952,9246560469ap2002
2002212,3524,714,1814.5%7024942,2595266769ap2003
2003233,5874,897,7304.8%6924932,5114969470ap2004
2004235,9224,879,5534.8%6631972,4325669572ap2005
201048,5015,309,000.9%73561293751111,08978ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 23 Feb 2014