Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Anthony Mullassery

Bishop of Quilon, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1960 Born
22 Dec 198424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Quilon, India
18 Apr 201858.2AppointedBishop of Quilon, India
3 Jun 201858.3Ordained BishopBishop of Quilon, India

MicroData Summary for Paul Anthony Mullassery
Bishop Paul Anthony Mullassery (born ) Bishop of Quilon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaithakody, Diocese of Quilon
Ordained BishopGrounds of, Fatima Mata National Autonomous, College

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quilon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 30 Apr 2018
  • c2+: CB, 25 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jun 2018

Quantcast